Trustees ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION UK
Charity number: 221026
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Neil Goran Macdonald | Trustee | 01 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Robin Mark Lancefield Mr | Trustee | 10 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Robin Adrian Whitehouse | Trustee | 26 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
KEITH BUDDEN | Trustee | 13 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr John Murlis | Trustee | 11 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sarah F L Holme | Trustee | 23 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD MILLS | Trustee | 08 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Moorcroft | Trustee | 08 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT CHARLES PASCOE DELLER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTOPHER CHARLES HENRY FRY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.