MARY WHETTON (OR WITTON) CHARITY

Charity number: 221062
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 24 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 03 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 26 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 17 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 26 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required