CHURCH OF ENGLAND CHILDREN'S SOCIETY

Charity number: 221124
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 26 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 26 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 29 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 29 August 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 25 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 25 August 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 17 August 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 17 August 2016 On time Download