Governance CHURCH OF ENGLAND CHILDREN'S SOCIETY

Charity number: 221124
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Registration history:
  • 07 May 1964: Standard registration
  • 11 April 2012: Funds received from 1108394 FAMILIES-FIRST (IW)
  • 16 May 2012: Funds received from 234906 FRIARS HOME FUND
  • 06 August 2018: Funds received from 252451 THE BIRD CHARITABLE TRUST
  • 13 June 2022: Funds received from 506558 THE VINEY TRUST
  • 15 February 2023: Funds received from 1153920 BEANII CHARITABLE TRUST
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • THE CHILDREN'S SOCIETY (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property