Trustees WENSLEYDALE AND SWALEDALE QUAKER TRUST

Charity number: 221137
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Friend Margaret Elizabeth Waterworth Trustee 01 January 2022
None on record
Friend Timothy Richard Francis Holman Trustee 01 January 2022
None on record
Friend Elizabeth Mary Burrage Trustee 18 April 2021
None on record
Phyllis Pointon Trustee 01 January 2021
THORNTON RUST KENNEL FIELD TRUST
Received: On time
FRIENDS OF THE DALES COUNTRYSIDE MUSEUM
Received: On time
Graham Birtle Trustee 13 January 2020
None on record
Graham Howard Taylor Trustee 01 July 2016
THE RELIGIOUS SOCIETY OF FRIENDS (QUAKERS) IN BRITAIN - NORTHUMBRIA AREA MEETING
Received: On time
Friend Jennifer Ann White Trustee 01 January 2016
None on record