ST PAUL'S HOMES SALISBURY

Charity number: 221147
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £819 £1.37k £1.38k £1.41k £1.43k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A