THE POORS ESTATE AND APPRENTICING CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity is for the benefit of people living in the parish of Wroxall. There are funds available to help needy people, award are given to pensioners and children in December. Help is also given to students and apprentices for the cost of books and tool.,
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 01 May 1964: Standard registration
- WROXALL CHARITY (Working name)
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jane Williams | Trustee | 18 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rupert James Parkin | Trustee | 12 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Evans | Trustee | 20 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tom Linstead | Trustee | 14 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
MR JIMMY MILLARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUSAN TRUELOVE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.54k | £24.52k | £24.57k | £23.54k | £24.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.55k | £17.90k | £13.62k | £30.64k | £17.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 15 December 2023 | 45 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 01 November 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 November 2021 | 25 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 14 JUNE 1878, VARYING SCHEME DATED 14 SEPTEMBER 1897 AND DETERMINATION ORDER DATED 26 AUGUST 1904
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INDUSTRIOUS POOR OF WROXALL.
Area of benefit
WROXALL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 School Cottages
School Lane
Wroxall
WARWICK
CV35 7NF
- Phone:
- 07776 133279
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window