Accounts and annual returns THE ALMSHOUSE CHARITY OF DAME FRANCES WRAY AND SIR CHRISTOPHER WRAY

Charity number: 221175
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 26 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 08 November 2020 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 08 November 2019 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 27 November 2018 27 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 17 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required