CHARITY OF MARGARET MOSCROP

Charity number: 221203
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £11.42k £11.48k £11.93k £12.57k £13.03k
Total expenditure £9.65k £9.00k £3.39k £8.25k £7.10k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A