HANDMAIDS OF THE SACRED HEART OF JESUS (REGENTS PARK, LONDON, AND CHRISTCHURCH, HANTS )

Charity number: 221319
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 25 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 25 June 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 30 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 30 June 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 27 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 27 June 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 29 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 29 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 26 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 26 May 2017 On time Download