Financial history THE SOCIETY OF ST COLUMBAN FOR FOREIGN MISSIONS

Charity number: 221594
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023
Total gross income £3.94m £3.47m £3.31m £3.75m £3.09m
Total expenditure £3.16m £2.63m £3.28m £3.64m £1.58m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £737 £28.22k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £3.77m £3.32m £3.16m £3.64m £2.84m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £2.84k £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £28.22k £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £162.04k £142.31k £99.55k £95.88k £245.51k
Income - Other £8.95k £7.43k £22.50k £5.05k £8.68k
Income - Legacies £1.81m £1.93m £1.34m £1.81m £1.20m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.97m £2.38m £3.06m £3.36m £1.32m
Expenditure - Raising funds £191.61k £255.00k £225.72k £284.92k £261.34k
Expenditure - Governance £36.53k £15.35k £17.61k £0 £13.75k
Expenditure - Grants institution £7.35k £6.05k £0 £0 £2.73k
Expenditure - Investment management £24.54k £28.69k £10.23k £28.24k £26.36k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0