Accounts and annual returns BOROUGH OF RAWTENSTALL PUBLIC WELFARE COMMITTEE

Charity number: 221598
Charity reporting is overdue by 1495 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2021 Overdue Overdue by 34 days
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 Overdue Overdue by 34 days
Annual return 31 October 2020 Overdue Overdue by 399 days
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Overdue Overdue by 399 days
Annual return 31 October 2019 Overdue Overdue by 764 days
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Overdue Overdue by 764 days
Annual return 31 October 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1130 days
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1130 days
Annual return 31 October 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1495 days
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1495 days