Financial history GOOD NEWS FOR EVERYONE!

Charity number: 221605
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £3.27m £3.33m £3.37m £2.61m £3.09m
Total expenditure £3.47m £2.65m £2.86m £2.45m £3.10m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £30.24k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £3.11m £3.19m £3.23m £2.53m £3.02m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £154.80k £136.63k £127.88k £73.27k £67.07k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £3.84k £3.03k £7.34k £6.07k £3.70k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £553.93k £702.47k £768.92k £638.52k £1.07m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.47m £2.65m £2.86m £2.45m £3.10m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £37.49k £57.38k £53.02k £38.46k £22.05k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0