Trustees GOOD NEWS FOR EVERYONE!
Charity number: 221605

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bill Thomas | Chair | 01 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Andrew David Newham | Trustee | 08 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Jeremy Edward Bass | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Fred Kershaw | Trustee | 03 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr Graeme Simpson | Trustee | 09 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Martin Hooper | Trustee | 09 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jane Elizabeth Fardell Mann | Trustee | 02 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rhoda Mary Bourne | Trustee | 04 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Graham John Ellis | Trustee | 23 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Heather Joy Capper | Trustee | 12 June 2020 |
|
|||||
Chris Axelby | Trustee | 07 May 2018 |
|
|||||
Rick Hillard | Trustee | 07 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ivan Johnston | Trustee | 07 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Iain Lyle Sinclair Gray | Trustee | 07 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Frances Erbetta | Trustee | 04 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Philip Stephen Bunting | Trustee | 01 May 2017 |
|
|||||
Graham John Beckett | Trustee | 05 May 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.