THE MERSEYSIDE CIVIC SOCIETY

Charity number: 221700
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Adrian Swift Trustee 22 November 2016 None on record
ERIK BICHARD Trustee 22 November 2016
FURNITURE RESOURCE CENTRE LIMITED Received: On time
TREVOR SKEMPTON Trustee None on record
SARAH-JANE FARR Trustee None on record
Gavin Davenport Chair 01 May 2018 None on record
DR D W MASSEY Trustee None on record
EILEEN WILLSHAW Trustee 26 November 2013 None on record
Daniel Bimpson Trustee 19 November 2020 None on record
DAI GWYNNE Trustee None on record
Peter Elson Trustee 22 November 2016
MERSEYSIDE ADVENTURE SAILING TRUST Received: On time
JEAN GRANT Trustee None on record
Pam Wilsher Trustee 20 November 2018 None on record