POOR'S LAND

Charity number: 221729
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 October 2020 13 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 October 2019 12 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 October 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 October 2018 14 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 October 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 October 2017 12 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 October 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 October 2016 13 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 October 2016 Not Required