POOR'S LAND

Charity number: 221729
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/10/2016 30/10/2017 30/10/2018 30/10/2019 30/10/2020
Total gross income £9.76k £11.16k £10.32k £9.05k £10.42k
Total expenditure £4.85k £6.23k £7.89k £11.47k £6.78k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A