POOR'S LAND

Charity number: 221729
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Joanna Cox Trustee 31 October 2016 None on record
DEREK MALCOLM HARRINGTON Trustee 15 March 2011 None on record
ROBERT LIONEL EAYRS Trustee 28 February 2012 None on record
Christine Joy Smith Trustee 30 November 2018 None on record
Dr Richard Baker Chair 30 October 2016 None on record
BARBARA JANE CLEMENCE Trustee None on record