Accounts and annual returns SOUTH BIRMINGHAM FRIENDS INSTITUTE TRUST

Charity number: 221748
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2021 31 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 31 May 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 18 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 18 July 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 06 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019

(These accounts
have been qualified)

06 June 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2018 04 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 04 April 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2017 26 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 26 March 2018 On time Download Open in new window