Financial history SOUTH BIRMINGHAM FRIENDS INSTITUTE TRUST

Charity number: 221748
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £70.92k £69.00k £73.39k £71.41k £69.29k
Total expenditure £58.58k £53.16k £57.55k £95.18k £696.91k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A