Trustees SOUTH BIRMINGHAM FRIENDS INSTITUTE TRUST

Charity number: 221748
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ROBERT FRANK MORRIS Chair
THE CENTRAL ENGLAND AREA QUAKER MEETING CHARITIES
Received: On time
THE FRIENDS HALL, GOOCH STREET, RECREATION GROUND TRUST
Received: On time
Michael Padbury Trustee 03 September 2019
None on record
Edward Talbot Trustee 20 March 2019
None on record
Heather Smithson Trustee 01 September 2017
None on record
DAVID ROBERT DUFF TAYLOR Trustee 29 November 2013
BIRMINGHAM COMMON GOOD TRUST
Received: On time
STUART MORTON Trustee 29 November 2013
None on record
Russell Steed Trustee 01 January 1983
None on record
ANNETTE GOUGH Trustee
None on record