Financial history DEFENCE SURVEYORS' ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 221816
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £17.50k £10.85k £11.65k £9.90k £4.72k
Total expenditure £17.81k £11.60k £11.34k £12.77k £3.99k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A