Trustees DEFENCE SURVEYORS' ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 221816
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DR JOHN KNIGHT Chair
None on record
John Francis Harold Fitzgerald Trustee 11 December 2021
None on record
Philip Wildman Trustee 12 September 2019
None on record
DR Yolande Hodson Trustee 13 September 2018
None on record
Colonel Mike Nolan Trustee 14 September 2017
None on record
Noel Grimmett Trustee 07 January 2016
None on record
Maj Charles Jenkins Trustee 11 September 2014
None on record
CARL CALVERT Trustee
None on record
MAJOR GENERAL ROY WOOD MAMSCFRICS Trustee
None on record
LT COL JAMES FERGUS PRAIN Trustee
None on record