SEYMOUR FIELDHOUSE HOMES

Charity number: 221993
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £21.44k £21.42k £20.05k £22.51k £23.06k
Total expenditure £12.34k £7.98k £4.06k £18.96k £19.04k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A