ST WILFRID'S ELEEMOSYNARY CHARITY

Charity number: 222048
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £833 £799 £859 £878 £896
Total expenditure £820 £820 £820 £820 £120
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A