Accounts and annual returns M B FOUNDATION (ALSO KNOWN AS MOSSAD HORAV MOSHE ARYEH HALEVY)

Charity number: 222104
Charity reporting is up to date (232 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 September 2022 232 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 20 September 2022 232 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 06 July 2020 157 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 06 July 2020 157 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 21 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 21 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 30 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 30 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window