ASHTON MEMORIAL FUND

Charity number: 222115
Charity reporting is overdue by 640 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 274 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 274 days
Annual return 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 640 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 640 days
Annual return 31 December 2017 10 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 01 December 2017 31 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 14 May 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required