Financial history THE RATCLIFF FOUNDATION

Charity number: 222441
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022
Total gross income £239.66k £240.32k £225.44k £192.44k £178.37k
Total expenditure £240.18k £272.33k £260.39k £213.39k £189.02k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A