Trustees ST ALBANS OLD PEOPLE'S TRUST

Charity number: 222522
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SUDABE GRAY Chair 28 July 2020
None on record
Dr SHONA LOUISE HYDE Trustee 01 June 2022
None on record
Caroline Rolfe Trustee 10 May 2021
SUTTON'S HOSPITAL IN CHARTERHOUSE
Received: On time
ARINRHOD PAZZI-AXWORTHY Trustee 21 August 2018
None on record
THE RT REVD JOHN WARREN GLADWIN Trustee 14 February 2017
WHEATHAMPSTEAD UNITED CHARITIES
Received: On time
ROBERT PHILLIP HILL Trustee 20 January 2014
None on record