THE MAGNUS CHARITY

Charity number: 222545
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 12 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 12 July 2021 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 30 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 30 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2019 28 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 28 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2018 04 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 04 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2017 20 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 20 December 2017 On time Download