THE MAGNUS CHARITY

Charity number: 222545
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £181.61k £209.04k £218.33k £230.06k £227.08k
Total expenditure £213.19k £239.92k £238.35k £256.80k £240.80k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A