THE MAGNUS CHARITY

Charity number: 222545
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Cllr Jay Henderson Trustee 12 June 2019
THE MAGNUS EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Received: On time
MICHAEL DAY BEAUMONT CBE Chair
THE MAGNUS EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Received: On time
THE NEWARK AREA ARTS AND LEISURE FOUNDATION Received: On time
David Saxelby Trustee 04 June 2019
THE MAGNUS EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Received: On time
MICHAEL FURNESS QC Trustee
THE MAGNUS EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Received: On time
GRAHAM CARTLEDGE Trustee
THE MAGNUS EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Received: On time
RICHARD WATKINSON Trustee
THE MAGNUS EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Received: On time
Cllr Stuart Wallace Trustee 27 September 2011
THE MAGNUS EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Received: On time
James Baggaley Trustee 12 June 2019
THE MAGNUS EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Received: On time
THE W E KNIGHT EDUCATION TRUST Received: On time
JAMES DERRY Trustee
THE MAGNUS EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Received: On time
Andrew Jonathan Fearn Trustee 20 November 2018
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF NEWARK ON TRENT ST MARY MAGDALENE WITH ST LEONARD Received: On time
THE MAGNUS EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Received: On time
THE NEWARK AREA ARTS AND LEISURE FOUNDATION Received: On time
Irene Brown Trustee 01 May 2019
THE MAGNUS EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Received: On time
ST LEONARD'S HOSPITAL Received: On time
MUNICIPAL GENERAL CHARITIES FOR THE POOR Received: On time
THE EAST AND WEST LAUGHTON ESTATE CHARITY Received: On time
JAMES HOWLETT Trustee
THE MAGNUS EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Received: On time
NEWARK EMMAUS TRUST Received: On time