ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS DERBY AND DISTRICT BRANCH

Charity number: 222620
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 10 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 10 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 27 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 27 June 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 24 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 24 July 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 18 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 18 August 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 14 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 14 October 2016 On time Download