SWINTON PENDLEBURY AND CLIFTON CARE OF THE ELDERLY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 222641
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020

(These accounts
have been qualified)

31 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 13 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 13 June 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 22 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 22 August 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 12 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

12 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 30 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

30 January 2017 On time Download