THE ROCHDALE FUND FOR RELIEF IN SICKNESS

Charity number: 222652
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £54.70k £59.19k £72.59k £74.68k £75.91k
Total expenditure £38.67k £40.64k £38.41k £47.56k £53.31k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A