THE CREWE AND DISTRICT SPASTICS SOCIETY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
Governance
- 20 April 1964: Standard registration
- 02 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
- THE EMMIE DIXON HOME (Working name)
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2009 | 11 September 2013 | 1314 days late | |
Annual return | 05 April 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2008 | 21 September 2009 | 228 days late | |
Annual return | 05 April 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2006 | 23 September 2009 | 961 days late | |
Annual return | 05 April 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2005 | 22 September 2009 | 1325 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 OCTOBER 1953 AMENDED 7 SEPTEMBER 1982 AND 7 JUNE 1983
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE, CAUSE TO BE PROVIDED, OR ASSIST IN PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR THE DISCOVERY AND AS FAR AS IS PRACTICABLE THE REGISTRATION OF ALL CHILDREN AND PERSONS SUFFERING FROM CEREBRAL PALSY AND ITS ALLIED CONDITIONS. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CONSTITUTION).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window