Trustees THE ABBEYFIELD NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity number: 222742
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MRS VEE WILKINSON Chair 16 May 2012
None on record
Patricia Frances Porter Trustee 17 November 2021
None on record
RAYMOND MACKINTOSH Trustee 19 July 2017
None on record
MARION JEAN ANDERSON Trustee 18 January 2017
THE FRIENDS OF LEAZES PARK
Received: On time
TYNESIDE DECORATIVE AND FINE ARTS SOCIETY
Received: On time
CAROLE LESLEY EKE JP, BEd Trustee 22 January 2014
THE NEWCASTLE CENTRAL AND EAST CIRCUIT OF THE METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
TRINITY CHURCH GOSFORTH
Received: On time
BRIAN DUELL Trustee 16 May 2012
ST AIDAN'S COMMUNITY CENTRE ORGANISATION
Received: On time
ANTHONY WILLIAM KAY Trustee 20 March 2002
None on record