ROWSLEY VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
MANAGE AND MAINTAIN ROWSLEY VILLAGE HALL FOR THE BENEFIT OF ALL LOCAL PEOPLE. THE AIM OF THE CHARITY IS TO PROVIDE LOCAL ACCESS TO EDUCATION AND RECREATION FACILITIES; AND TO PROVIDE COMMUNITY AND SOCIAL ACTIVITIES FOR LOCAL PEOPLE, WITH THE AIM TO PROMOTE INDIVIDUAL WELL BEING AND AND A SENSE OF COMMUNITY BELONGING.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
Total income includes £4,025 from 5 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 10 February 1964: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Marianne Quick | Chair | 02 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kerry Worthington | Trustee | 29 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stewart Warren | Trustee | 29 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jo-Ann Wildgoose | Trustee | 30 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Daniele Whittaker | Trustee | 24 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Alison Frances Wells | Trustee | 24 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
William Fell | Trustee | 24 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Claire Mead | Trustee | 11 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Croasdale | Trustee | 27 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Magda Prince | Trustee | 27 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
MARY POPE | Trustee | 19 July 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £41.29k | £30.66k | £30.86k | £21.62k | £19.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £39.86k | £27.25k | £15.57k | £17.89k | £33.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.10k | £10.00k | £21.37k | £11.99k | £4.03k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 16 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 20 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 12 September 2022 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 12 September 2022 | 44 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 07 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 07 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 17 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 17 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 9/10/1929 AS AMENDED 12/11/97 LEASE DATED 1962, NEW LEASE DATED 5 AUGUST 1988. as amended on 16 Feb 2022
Charitable objects
TO AFFORD THE MEANS OF EDUCATIONAL PURPOSES SOCIAL INTERCOURSE, MUTUAL HELPFULNESS AND RATIONAL RECREATION PRINCIPALLY FOR THE BENEFIT OF LOCAL INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
ROWSLEY AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Rowsley Village Hall
School Lane
Rowsley
Derbyshire
DE4 2EE
- Phone:
- 07545 704384
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window