FULWOOD SENIOR CITIZENS CENTRE COMMITTEE

Charity number: 222823
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £19.68k £19.52k £17.76k £18.35k £17.65k
Total expenditure £22.81k £17.34k £17.32k £18.05k £20.41k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A