SOUTH ELMSALL UNITED CHARITIES

Charity number: 222870
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £1.85k £1.78k £1.92k £1.97k £2.01k
Total expenditure £992 £880 £1.10k £1.10k £1.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A