FRIENDS OF YORK MINSTER

Charity number: 222871
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Catherine Champness Trustee 09 June 2018
FRIENDS OF YORK MINSTER Recently registered
Margaret Robertson Glenwright Shorland-Ball Trustee 27 February 2014
FRIENDS OF YORK MINSTER Recently registered
Helen Gregory Trustee 29 June 2019
FRIENDS OF YORK MINSTER Recently registered
Susan Wood Trustee 09 June 2018
FRIENDS OF YORK MINSTER Recently registered
AILEEN MARGERY BLOOMER Trustee 12 June 2020
HARTRIGG OAKS CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
PEOPLE, LANDSCAPE & CULTURAL ENVIRONMENT, EDUCATION AND RESEARCH CENTRE Received: On time
FRIENDS OF YORK MINSTER Recently registered
Rt Reve Dr Jonathan Hugh Frost Trustee 02 February 2019 None on record
John Vincent Morley Trustee 09 June 2018
FRIENDS OF YORK MINSTER Recently registered
Rev Gwynne Wright Trustee 15 July 2021
FRIENDS OF YORK MINSTER Recently registered
THE CAIRN TERRIER RELIEF FUND Received: On time
Julia Charlton-Weedy Chair 24 May 2017
FRIENDS OF YORK MINSTER Recently registered
David Andrew Hare Trustee 24 April 2020
FRIENDS OF YORK MINSTER Recently registered
Dr David Stocks Trustee 15 July 2021
FRIENDS OF YORK MINSTER Recently registered
Dr Trevor Julian Trustee 29 June 2019
FRIENDS OF YORK MINSTER Recently registered