Financial history BARNARD KENNETH HUFTON CHARITY

Charity number: 222994
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £201.25k £180.12k £143.52k £182.30k £85.32k
Total expenditure £102.90k £149.60k £127.90k £197.99k £71.22k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A