Accounts and annual returns BLAND'S CHARITY
Charity number: 223016

Charity reporting is overdue by 939 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 209 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 209 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Overdue by 574 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Overdue by 574 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Overdue by 939 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Overdue by 939 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 09 October 2019 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 03 October 2018 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window