Trustees JOHN HOLFORD'S CHARITY

Charity number: 223046
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
CHRISTOPHER GORDON HENRETTY Trustee 27 November 2023
CHURCH WOOD CONSERVATION GROUP
Overdue by 480 days
KNUTSFORD HERITAGE CENTRE
Received: On time
MRS D M FRANCE-HAYHURST CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
DENIS MURPHY Trustee 27 November 2023
LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THE MACCLESFIELD AND CONGLETON HOSPITALS
Received: On time
THE CONGLETON TOWN TRUST
Received: On time
THE CONGLETON COMMUNITY TRUST
Received: On time
CONGLETON TALKING NEWSPAPER
Received: On time
Rev Ian Peter Enticott Trustee 22 July 2020
None on record
Rev Anne-Marie Naylor Trustee 04 June 2020
None on record
Fionnuala Mary Keen Trustee 11 May 2020
None on record
Isabella Roberts Trustee 03 October 2016
None on record
Rev SIMON DREW Trustee 13 August 2013
None on record