DERBY TOC H CHILDREN'S CAMP

Charity number: 223219
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020
Total gross income £65.62k £74.78k £64.63k £62.25k £28.13k
Total expenditure £46.97k £54.61k £45.51k £66.67k £7.72k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A