Accounts and annual returns CENTRAL BIBLE HAMMOND TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 223327
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 26 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 26 August 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 25 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 25 August 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 03 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 03 September 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 01 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 01 September 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 12 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 12 September 2017 On time Download Open in new window