Financial history CENTRAL BIBLE HAMMOND TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 223327
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £44.89k £45.63k £67.26k £180.69k £80.43k
Total expenditure £47.21k £45.61k £50.20k £49.95k £44.80k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A