Accounts and annual returns MARGARET EARLE FOR THE POOR

Charity number: 223460
Charity reporting is overdue by 44 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2023 Overdue Overdue by 44 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Overdue Overdue by 44 days
Annual return 30 June 2022 28 April 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 18 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 12 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 04 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required