Financial history BIRMINGHAM REPERTORY THEATRE LIMITED

Charity number: 223660
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £13.25m £11.10m £10.31m £6.36m £12.59m
Total expenditure £13.29m £11.51m £11.39m £4.43m £10.13m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £241.45k £227.40k
Income from government grants £2.36m £2.03m £1.99m £4.95m £5.09m
Income - Donations and legacies £3.01m £2.80m £2.76m £5.32m £6.07m
Income - Other trading activities £2.69m £3.12m £2.79m £724.00k £1.60m
Income - Charitable activities £7.53m £5.14m £4.71m £293.00k £4.83m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £27.00k £20.00k £54.00k £26.00k £95.00k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £26.00k £5.00k £8.00k £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £11.24m £9.11m £9.16m £3.71m £8.71m
Expenditure - Raising funds £2.05m £2.40m £2.24m £727.00k £1.40m
Expenditure - Governance £1.00k £17.00k £3.00k £0 £1.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £3.00k £5.00k £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £20.00k