SIGHT SUPPORT HULL AND EAST YORKSHIRE

Charity number: 223668
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £521.49k £664.36k £1.09m £521.36k £608.67k
Total expenditure £781.60k £491.94k £801.01k £580.19k £757.40k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £5.60k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £105.76k £316.69k £749.23k £135.55k £275.66k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £44.87k
Income - Charitable activities £322.31k £266.09k £253.63k £297.19k £215.01k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £93.43k £81.59k £87.31k £88.62k £73.13k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £65.38k £191.34k £658.34k £100.43k £143.38k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £769.32k £338.51k £547.67k £474.78k £652.59k
Expenditure - Raising funds £12.29k £153.43k £253.34k £105.41k £104.81k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £5.73k £5.73k £209.64k £6.82k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £12.29k £11.92k £13.85k £14.77k £14.09k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0